Accounts and annual returns ROBERT ABEL BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 247541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 23 July 2024 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 23 July 2024 662 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 13 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required