THAXTED UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity Number: 247545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A religious body, part of a church formed under an Act of Parliament in 1972.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £33,979
Total expenditure: £58,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THAXTED URC (Working name)
  • THAXTED CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Mark Philip Hayes Trustee 23 July 2022
RSA TRUST
Received: On time
Dame Katharine Barker Trustee 15 April 2014
None on record
JULIE MARIE BARNARD Trustee
None on record
RICHARD MERVYN FREEMAN Trustee
None on record
SUSAN LYDIA FREEMAN Trustee
THAXTED RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Received: 13 days late
MARY DE MONTFICHET JOHNES POOR FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.10k £17.86k £22.13k £19.26k £33.98k
Total expenditure £24.45k £17.87k £17.86k £23.22k £58.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 APRIL 1947
Charitable objects
A RESIDENCE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL BULFORD STREET THAXTED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 25 April 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
BARN HOUSE
WATLING LANE
THAXTED
DUNMOW
CM6 2QX
Phone:
01371830499
Website:

No information available