Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD (CLAPHAM) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 247653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.48k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.71k £5.62k £44.87k £1.01k £42.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A