Accounts and annual returns RESIDENCE FOR A ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIEST

Charity number: 247664
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required