MILITARY JUBILEE LODGE NO 2195 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Masonic Lodge in Province of East Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP HEATH | Chair | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter White | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan William Shirley | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander McMillan | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Prescott | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sidney Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
R J HORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.67k | £673 | £406 | £439 | £497 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.95k | £3.21k | £1.35k | £2.73k | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 February 2025 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST APRIL, 1966.
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS AND THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CHURCH ROAD
LITTLEBOURNE
CANTERBURY
CT3 1UD
- Phone:
- 07946401031
- Email:
- alan.shirley@live.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window