PERRY TRUST GIFT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1966, the income from the fund is used to make grants to persons of good character in need of financial assistance to maintain a reasonable standard of living. This is intended for people who have very little private means . Grants are made once a year in either May or November, and applicants may apply again in another year if they so wish. Applicants must have lived
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 June 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NIGEL CULLEN SOLICITOR | Chair | 17 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Joanne Ellis | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Hanson | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Davies | Trustee | 23 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN RAMSDEN | Trustee | 11 November 1993 |
|
|||||
REV J STAPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.27k | £11.59k | £11.52k | £12.53k | £12.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.96k | £13.43k | £13.50k | £16.33k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 05/08/1964 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/09/1975 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/09/1991 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 18/11/2010
Charitable objects
INCOME TO PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MAINTAIN A REASONABLE STANDARD OF LIVING IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PREFERENCE. (A) TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO HAD BEEN ASSOCIATED WITH THE DECEASED OR HER FATHER BY WAY OF FRIENDSHIP OR AS EMPLOYEES. (B) TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS HAVE FORMELY BEEN ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION OR BUSINESS IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND PERSONS OF HITHERTO INDEPENDENT MEANS NOT ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION OR BUSINESS WHO THROUGH NO FAULT OF THEIR OWN ARE NO LONGER ABLE TO MAINTAIN A REASONABLE STANDARD OF LIVING WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING THEIR APPLICATION FOR A GRANT LIVED IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM . (C) TO ASSIST OTHER PERSONS WHO FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS HAVE LIVED IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM. (D) TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS HAVE LIVED IN THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM. (E) TO OTHER DESERVING PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE SCHEME OF 2 SEPTEMBER 1991.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM AND NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anna Chandler
PO Box 11228
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6YY
- Phone:
- 07354875035
- Email:
- anna@chandler-cc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window