Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR ARMY HISTORICAL RESEARCH

Charity number: 247844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Bamford Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Simon James Shephard Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Giles Rackley Orpen-Smellie Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
James Peter Cook Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Frederick William Hyde Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Dr Andrew Simpson Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Peter Kenneth Swabey Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Dr Nicola Martin Trustee 14 August 2023
JACOBITE STUDIES TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Ian Beckett Trustee 12 June 2023
THE ARMY RECORDS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Zeb Micic Trustee 12 June 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY, BOURNE STREET, LONDON
Received: On time
Rohan Saravanamuttu BSc MA ACA Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Dr ANDREW CORMACK BA FSA Trustee
None on record