STANLEY SMITH CHARITABLE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 247884
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. Grants are made primarily to charities in the West Midlands and to charities benefiting people (rather than animals or buildings). 2. Applications for support from individuals are not normally considered although applications from charities on behalf of such individuals will be considered

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022

Total income: £22,493
Total expenditure: £14,690

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1966: Standard registration
  • 08 December 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 08 December 2023: Funds transferred to 220473 THE MICHAEL MARSH CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £18.39k £20.45k £20.31k £17.53k £22.49k
Total expenditure £17.63k £18.24k £16.97k £20.95k £14.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required