Linked charities CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE 9TH/12TH ROYAL LANCERS (PRINCE OF WALES')
Charity number: 247900
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 20 MARCH 1961, 2 OCTOBER 1961, 22 OCTOBER 1965 AND 18 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO BE APPLIED FOR 1) IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OR ASSISTANCE OF ANY PAST OR PRESENT NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS OR OF THE 9TH QUEENS ROYAL LANCERS WHO THROUGH WOUNDS, SICKNESS OR OTHERWISE MAY BE UNFIT FOR ACTIVE SERVICE OR BE WHOLLY OR PARTLY INCAPACITATED FROM EARNING THEIR OWN LIVING OR ANY OF THE WIVES OR CHILDREN OF SUCH NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS OR MEN. 2) IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OR ASSISTANCE OF ANY OF THE WIDOWS OR CHILDREN OF ANY DECEASED NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS OR MEN OF THE 9TH/12TH ROYAL LANCERS (PRINCE OF WALES') OR OF THE 9TH QUEENS ROYAL LANCERS. 3) IN ANY OTHER MANNER FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PAST OR PRESENT NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS OR MEN OF THE 9TH/12TH ROYAL LANCERS (PRINCE OF WALES) OR OF THE 9TH QUEENS COMMISSIONED OFFICERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 11 May 1966 : Standard registration
- 04 December 1991 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.