Financial history CARLBY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 247909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £197 £176 £217 £197 £309
Total expenditure £137 £0 £450 £130 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A