INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP OF EVANGELICAL STUDENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IFES is a movement of students sharing and living out the good news of Jesus Christ. Locally. Nationally. Globally. IFES works in more than 170 countries to establish and support student-led indigenous Christian movements. Our vision is to see students built into communities of disciples, transformed by the gospel and impacting the university, the church and society for the glory of Christ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£8,353,709
Donations and legacies | £7.39m | |
Charitable activities | £593.60k | |
Other trading activities | £54.28k | |
Investments | £124.75k | |
Other | £192.83k |
Total expenditure:
£7,134,829
Raising funds | £487.51k | |
Charitable activities | £6.65m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £487.51k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.65m | |
Retained for future use | £1.22m |
People

95 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Algeria
- Angola
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cayman Islands
- Chad
- Chile
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guadeloupe
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Liberia
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Malta
- Martinique
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 13 June 1966: Standard registration
- I F E S TRUST (Previous name)
- I F E S TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mae Patterson | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lazaro Busagala | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azar Ajaj | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ravena Pereira | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Windsor | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Knarik Saribekyan | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eden Hale | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHEL KENMOGNE | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iram Anjum | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Patricio Morillo | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jacobs | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Smith | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christian Rasmussen | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fatouma Gouda Sare Keita | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Epp Buckingham | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65m | £4.40m | £4.60m | £7.64m | £8.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.09m | £4.18m | £5.02m | £6.64m | £7.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.52k | £5.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.73m | £4.14m | £4.52m | £7.39m | £7.39m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £44.61k | £0 | £25.81k | £33.03k | £54.28k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £806.54k | £92.52k | £47.07k | £208.95k | £593.60k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £17.47k | £5.17k | £291 | £3.69k | £124.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £59.08k | £160.95k | £7.91k | £5.35k | £192.83k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £68.82k | £215.67k | £38.78k | £113.31k | £248.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.76m | £3.89m | £4.67m | £6.26m | £6.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £331.09k | £293.65k | £347.86k | £382.27k | £487.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £19.60k | £30.59k | £48.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £1.56m | £1.70m | £1.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.40m | £2.16m | £2.11m | £2.26m | £1.74m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £35.22k | £357.56k | £33.20k | |
|
Other assets | £3.09m | £2.85m | £2.57m | £3.75m | £5.70m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £706.94k | £277.96k | £245.89k | £377.40k | £563.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/04/1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY: PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND MAINTAINING AN INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP OF NATIONAL CHRISTIAN STUDENT MINISTRIES (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS NATIONAL MOVEMENTS); SEEKING TO AWAKEN AND DEEPEN PERSONAL FAITH IN THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FURTHER EVANGELISTIC WORK AMONG STUDENTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; AND PROVIDING FOR FELLOWSHIP ON A WORLDWIDE AND REGIONAL BASIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
I F E S
BLUE BOAR HOUSE
5 BLUE BOAR STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4EE
- Phone:
- 01865263777
- Email:
- info@ifesworld.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window