COMMUNITY OF CHRIST (BIRMINGHAM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Service 11.00 Tae Kwon Do Sunday 16.30 Coffee Morning last Saturday of Month
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 09 May 1966: Standard registration
- 06 September 1994: Removed
- COMMUNITY OF CHRIST (Working name)
- THE REORGANIZED CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER DAY SAINTS, BIRMINGHAM BRANCH (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.07k | £4.71k | £5.32k | £4.39k | £8.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.52k | £3.40k | £5.82k | £3.90k | £9.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 09 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 24 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 07 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHURCH CONSTITUTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES ADOPTED 5/4/52 AS AMENDED ON 14/2/10
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AND STATEMENTS OF BELIEF OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHRIST.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND DISTRICT.
Linked charities
- 09 May 1966 : Standard registration
- 06 September 1994 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window