COMMUNITY OF CHRIST (NUNEATON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE COMMUNITY OF CHRIST IS A CHRISTIAN CHURCH WHOSE PURPOSE AND MISSION IS TO PROCLAIM JESUS CHRIST AND PROMOTE COMMUNITIES OF JOY, HOPE, LOVE, AND PEACE. THE CHARITY IS BASED IN THE NUNEATON AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £725 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 May 1966: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY OF CHRIST (Working name)
- THE REORGANIZED CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER DAY SAINTS, NUNEATON BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Rathbone | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine chapman | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Pearce | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHAPMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.89k | £15.06k | £18.57k | £21.52k | £16.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.60k | £10.84k | £18.48k | £18.60k | £22.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £692 | £2.74k | N/A | £725 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHURCH CONSTITUTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES ADOPTED 05/04/1952 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AND STATEMENTS OF BELIEF OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHRIST
Area of benefit
NUNEATON AND DISTRICT.
Linked charities
- 09 May 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 WHITTLEFORD ROAD
NUNEATON
CV10 9JD
- Phone:
- 01827 711470
- Email:
- nuneaton@cofchrist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window