THE COLEMAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of farmers or agriculturists resident in the county of Kent who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 23 May 1966: Standard registration
- RICHARD VINCENT COLEMAN CHARITY FOR ALMSHOUSE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Baker | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Colin Elworthy | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN PLOMMER | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||
MR MIKE BAX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL STEWART DUNN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.89k | £4.67k | £5.17k | £4.61k | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £10.11k | £3.84k | £60 | £9.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2 NOVEMBER 1998. as amended on 19 Jun 2023as amended on 19 Jun 2023as amended on 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FARMERS OR AGRICULTURISTS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WEST LANGDON AND COUNTY OF KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
92
Marlborough Crescent
Sevenoaks
Sevenoaks
Kent
TN13 2HR
- Phone:
- 07957614162
- Email:
- emma.baker2008@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window