BROWNHILLS AND DISTRICT FELLOWSHIP FOR THE HANDICAPPED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All assets etc were transferred to the new charity Brownhills and Walsall Wood Fellowship at end of financial year April 2008.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 07 July 1966: Standard registration
- BROWNHILLS AND DISTRICT FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Deakin | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN PAUL | Trustee | 11 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA D DEAKIN JP | Trustee | 01 April 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION: AS AMENDED 15 APRIL 1978, 10 FEBRUARY 1981 AND 9 JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
1. THE WELFARE OF THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED RESIDING IN THE AREA OF THE BROWNHILLS URBAN DISTRICT. 2. TO ACT AS A CO-ORDINATING COMMITTEE FOR SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
BROWNHILLS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROWNHILLS & DISTRICT FELLOWSHIP
THE MEGAN DU BOISSON COMPLEX
BEACON WAY
WALSALL
WS9 9HZ
- Phone:
- 07905246626
- Email:
- centrebwwf@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window