BROOKSIDE COTTAGE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides separate Almshouse accommodation for two Almspeople in the Parish of Tatenhill, Staffordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 December 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Parkes | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Charles Simpson | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Richards | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Morton | Trustee | 22 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Berian Joshua Griffiths | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR ROD EASTER | Trustee | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.84k | £32.46k | £13.64k | £11.84k | £13.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.15k | £43.78k | £8.97k | £11.61k | £27.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH AUGUST 1965 AND SCHEME OF THE 5TH APRIL 1967
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF ALMSHOUSES FOR EITHER (1) MEN AND WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND WHO HAVE RESIDED IN ANY OF THE PARISHES OF TATENHILL, BRANSTON, ANSLOW AND DUNSTALL FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS (TOGETHER WITH THEIR HUSBAND OF WIFE AS THE CASE MAY BE) 2) THE WIDOW OR WIDOWER OF A PERSON APPOINTED UNDER 1) HEREOF WHO SHALL HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN ANY OF THE ALMSHOUSES AT THE TIME OF THEIR DEATH.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF TATENHILL, BRANSTON, ANSLOW AND DUNSTALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Stables
Barton Gate
Barton Under Needwood
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE13 8BP
- Phone:
- 01283711830
- Email:
- r.tomlinson@ymail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window