Financial history THE BRITISH PIG ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 248119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £428.81k £274.46k £258.78k £264.84k £164.04k
Total expenditure £455.53k £296.42k £271.92k £346.65k £241.39k
Income from government contracts £16.60k £1.60k N/A £37.70k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.51k