WHITWELL COMMON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environment/conservation/heritage. Enable public access.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 01 July 1966: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Taylor | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HAWTREY-EASTWOOD | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE LUDGATE | Trustee | 13 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LIN GARLAND | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172 | £5.13k | £2.66k | £2.94k | £5.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £316 | £3.54k | £2.84k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14/03/1905 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/08/1935 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/03/2012 as amended on 19 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
GRAZING FOR LIVESTOCK OF QUALIFIED COMMONERS WHICH IS LIMITED TO TWO BEASTS SPLIT HOOF AND ONE BEAST ROUND HOOF AND NOT MORE PER PERSON.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WHITWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Common Cottage
Whitwell Common
Whitwell
NORWICH
NR10 4RF
- Phone:
- 01603872460
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window