THE WELSH BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 248192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity works with member churches in Wales or associated with Wales, facilitating co-operation between the charity, member churches and other Christian groups, with the object of the furtherance of the Gospel of Christ in accordance with the principles of the Baptists.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £130,446
Total expenditure: £125,677

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1966: Standard registration
  • 11 July 2023: Funds received from 502929 ABERFAN BAPTIST MEMORIAL FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GLYNDWR SAMUEL PRIDEAUX Chair 24 March 2015
THE BAPTIST UNION OF WALES
Received: 113 days late
Helen Mary Jones Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Robert Scourfield Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Arall Iwan Davies Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Aldyth Mary Williams Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Reverend Sue Phillips Trustee 10 June 2016
THE GWENT BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ELIM BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Revd Elfryn Jones Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
David Michael Evans Trustee 05 April 2016
None on record
Rev Judith Anne Morris Trustee 24 February 2015
THE BAPTIST UNION OF WALES
Received: 113 days late
CYTUN:EGLWYSI YNGHYD YNG NGHYMRU / CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WALES LIMITED
Received: On time
CYNGOR YSGOLION SUL AC ADDYSG GRISTNOGOL CYMRU
Received: On time
MR BILL DAVIES Trustee 08 August 2013
CYMDEITHAS EISTEDDFODAU CYMRU
Received: On time
TABERNACL, EGLWYS Y BEDYDDWYR
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST UNION OF WALES
Received: 113 days late
FRANCIS HAROLD MAULL Trustee
BROAD HAVEN BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
D MARC OWEN Trustee
MORIAH BAPTIST CHURCH RISCA
Received: On time
The Ugly Duckling Charity
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST MISSIONARY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE GWENT BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
WALESWIDE CYMRUGYFAN
Recently registered
HUGH BENJAMIN TRIBE Trustee
None on record
REVEREND IRFON CARADOG ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £398.69k £78.47k £191.23k £61.57k £130.45k
Total expenditure £135.94k £134.89k £201.74k £132.31k £125.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Swyddfa UBC/BUW Office
Parc Dewi Sant
Heol Ffynnon Job
CAERFYRDDIN
SA31 3HB
Phone:
0345 222 1514