Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM WATERHOUSE FOR AGED POOR PERSONS

Charity number: 248207
Charity reporting is overdue by 1090 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Annual return 12 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Annual return 12 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1090 days
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1090 days
Annual return 12 July 2020 06 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 12 July 2019 06 April 2021 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2019 Not Required