THE HYMN SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hymn Society of Great Britain and Ireland, encouraging study and research in hymnody; promoting good standards of hymn-singing; encouraging the discerning use of hymns and songs in worship; sponsoring relevant publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 June 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD DR JANET WOOTTON | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Revd Dr Andrew Pratt | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ernest Leckebusch | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Garland | Trustee |
|
||||||
Robert Canham Rev | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.88k | £13.96k | £13.19k | £30.93k | £35.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.07k | £12.56k | £12.51k | £37.85k | £35.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST JULY 1973 as amended on 25 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE STUDY AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE HYMN AS AN EXPRESSION OF WORSHIP AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY MAY BRING TOGETHER FOR STUDY, RESEARCH AND FELLOWSHIP THOSE WHO ARE INTERESTED IN HYMS, WHETHER IN THEIR WORDS OR MUSIC, AND MAKE INTERNATIONAL CONTACTS TO THIS END. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Whimbrel Road
Quedgeley
GLOUCESTER
GL2 4LJ
- Phone:
- 01452720872
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window