Financial history THE WAY TO LIFE MINISTRY

Charity number: 248273
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/05/2015 31/05/2016
Total gross income £87.41k £166.60k £400.62k £151.06k £31.08k
Total expenditure £337.90k £287.93k £285.30k £308.23k £6.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0