WORSLEY CIVIC TRUST AND AMENITY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental / Conservation / Heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Salford City
Governance
- 08 August 1966: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alan Jenkins | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CORLESS | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE SUSAN BROOMHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £884 | £1.49k | £1.22k | £2.35k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £461 | £1.08k | £885 | £632 | £1.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 3 APRIL, 1964 PROPOSED AND ACCEPTED AT MEMBERS MEETING.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BY CHARITABLE MEANS THE FOLLOWING:- TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN IN TOWN PLANNING OF WORSLEY URBAN DISTRICT. TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS. TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST; TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY MEANS OF MEETING EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, OTHER FORMS OF INSTRUCTION AND PUBLICITY, AND PROMOTION OF SCHEMES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
WORSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 GRANGE ROAD
ECCLES
MANCHESTER
M30 8JQ
- Phone:
- 01617892023
- Email:
- Annebroomhead@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
worsleycivictrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window