ARROW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of Village hall for community use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Dover | Chair | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Briars | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Freer | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £21.68k | £13.03k | £4.52k | £7.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.18k | £1.63k | £3.01k | £21.34k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1928. CONVEYANCE IN FEE SIMPLE OF THE 31ST JANURARY, 1947.
Charitable objects
TRUSEES SHOULD HOLD THE VILLAGE HALL UPON TRUST TO PERMIT THE SAME TO BE APPROPRIATED AND USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF SOCIAL GATHERINGS FUNCTIONS ENTERTAINMENTS AND LECTURES ETC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISHIONERS OF ARROW WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OPINIONS AND OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Park View
Arrow
ALCESTER
Warwickshire
B49 5PN
- Phone:
- 01789764825
- Email:
- dickieandannie@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window