NEUADD GOFFA PENYGROES / MEMORIAL HALL PENYGROES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage the village hall in Penygroes for the beenfit of the people of Penygroes and surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 21 June 1966: Standard registration
- NEUADD GOFFA PENYGROES (Working name)
- MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- MEMORIAL HALL PENYGROES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEN GREGORY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GLADYS JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Beryl Fretwell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MENAI JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARYS MENAI WILLIAMS BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN WILLIAMS M R PHARMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.90k | £27.94k | £5.54k | £8.84k | £7.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.11k | £9.14k | £8.06k | £7.69k | £11.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 12 MAY 1926 AS REPLACED BY SCHEME DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
HALL FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PEN-Y-GROES.
Area of benefit
PENYGROES
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 CLYNNOG ROAD
PENYGROES
CAERNARFON
LL54 6NP
- Phone:
- 01286881413
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window