THE LATIN MASS SOCIETY

Charity number: 248388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary purpose of the charity is the promotion of the celebration of the Mass and all liturgical offices and services in the Roman Catholic Church in the rite codified by the Council of Trent and in a form no later than that published in 1962.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR THE HONOURABLE ALEXANDER JOSEPH RANALD SHAW Chair
ST CATHERINE'S TRUST FOR TRADITIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Antonia Robinson Trustee 29 June 2024
None on record
KEVIN JONES Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Sarah Ward Trustee 17 June 2023
None on record
Aileen Seymour Trustee 17 June 2023
None on record
ROGER WEMYSS BROOKS Trustee 04 September 2021
None on record
Nicholas Ross Trustee 20 July 2019
None on record
ALASTAIR TOCHER Trustee 11 August 2018
THE SCHOLA GREGORIANA OF CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
DAVID FORSTER Trustee 24 June 2017
FRIENDS OF SAN BENEDETTO, NORCIA
Received: 1 day late
LEARNING FUTURES (WEST WILTS) LIMITED
Received: 101 days late
PAUL WADDINGTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £342.94k £143.73k £318.91k £270.72k £948.20k
Total expenditure £292.51k £240.58k £281.18k £326.09k £343.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £842.50k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.06k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £45.38k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £38.07k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.19k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £760.54k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £280.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £63.28k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £24.80k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.04k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £29.25k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.75m
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £336.39k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £70.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LATIN MASS SOCIETY
9 MALLOW STREET
LONDON
EC1Y 8RQ
Phone:
02074047284