Financial history THE SPENCER HOMES CHARITY

Charity number: 248397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/12/2019 28/12/2020 28/12/2021 28/12/2022 28/12/2023
Total gross income £40.60k £38.05k £55.76k £37.04k £39.88k
Total expenditure £13.65k £15.16k £16.48k £37.90k £19.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A