THE COMMUNICATIONS AND PUBLIC SERVICE LIFEBOAT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lifeboat Fund (formerly called CISPOTEL) is an official charity of the Civil Service and receives donations from Royal Mail and BT staff. The Fund raises money for the RNLI to provide new lifeboats and to train and equip crews. Since it was founded in 1866, The Lifeboat Fund has provided 54 lifeboats, saving over 4,700 lives and has helped refurbish a lifeboat station on the River Thames.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 June 1966: Standard registration
- THE LIFEBOAT FUND (Working name)
- CIVIL SERVICE AND POST OFFICE LIFE BOAT FUND (Previous name)
- CIVIL SERVICE,POST OFFICE AND BRITISH TELECOM LIFEBOAT FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Simon Case CVO | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Headworth | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jamieson | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toni Court | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Derek Briggs | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Riddle | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Tristan Wyndham Dunstan | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Paul Lawler | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lamb BEM | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corin Jean Stella Robertson | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebekka Burrows | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Davies | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Robinson | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES KILNER MBE | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Saunders | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.13k | £70.87k | £72.43k | £108.33k | £48.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.33k | £53.00k | £90.71k | £112.48k | £67.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECTS AND METHOD OF MANAGEMENT AS APPROVED 8 JULY 1949 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 6 MARCH 1969 AS AMENDED BY AGM 1984 AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION DATED 16 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED ON 22 APRIL 2015 as amended on 10 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND SHALL BE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF LIFE AT SEA BY RAISING MONEY TO FURTHER THE WORK OF THE RNLI BY PROVIDING FROM TIME TO TIME THE COST, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, OF REPLACEMENT OF CISPOTEL BOATS AND/OR ADDITIONAL LIFEBOATS AT OTHER STATIONS; AND IN ANY OTHER RELATED MANNER THAT MAY BE AGREED BETWEEN CISPOTEL AND THE RNLI.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honorary Secretary
Civil Service Lifeboat Fund
Department for Work and Pensions
2 St Peters Square
Manchester
M2 3AA
- Phone:
- 0300 038 9303
- Email:
- lifeboat.fund@dwp.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window