Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH SERBIAN ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST APOSTLES

Charity number: 248424
Charity reporting is overdue by 1653 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1653 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1653 days