THE NATIONAL CHRYSANTHEMUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Promoting the cultivation of chrysanthemums. 2. Awarding medals and certificates of merit. 3. Issuing publications. 4. Keeping a comprehensive register of cultivars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 September 1966: Standard registration
- NCS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Eric Moss | Chair | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Pattison | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BROWNBRIDGE | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.04k | £17.04k | £28.04k | £25.06k | £17.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.12k | £44.94k | £41.49k | £39.38k | £36.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 12TH FEBRUARY 1964 - SEE RULES AND LETTER DATED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1966, AND SEE AMENDMENTS DATED 26/03/88, 18/03/89, 21/03/92, 20/03/93, 26/03/94, 18/03/95, 22/03/96, 21/03/97, 15/03/2003, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16/9/04.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CULTIVATION OF THE CHRYSANTHEMUM (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE OBJECTS CLAUSE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1377 Lincoln Road
Werrington
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 6LT
- Phone:
- 01270 820911
- Website:
-
chrysanthemum-ncs.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window