Accounts and annual returns HUSBORNE CRAWLEY CHARITY ESTATE

Charity number: 248497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2024 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 October 2024 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 November 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late Download Open in new window