Governing document HUSBORNE CRAWLEY CHARITY ESTATE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
APPORTIONMENT ORDER DATED 28TH JANUARY 1896. SCHEMES OF 4TH JULY 1865, 8TH AUGUST 1871, 29TH JULY 1884 P.R. 10 PAGE 10. REPLACED BY SCHEME 12 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY ARE: 1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO: A) ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND B) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 2) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 3) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS WHO: A) ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS; AND B) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
HUSBORNE CRAWLEY, BEDFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.