HERAPATH-SHENTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Isle of Wight Charities and in particular Yarmouth Parish Church and Yarmouth ( Isle of Wight) Town Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 15 August 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Oliver Willard | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN REEVES HARRISON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN SUGGETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH FREDERICK GRIST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.89k | £58.86k | £44.72k | £53.03k | £59.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.27k | £68.27k | £54.06k | £54.74k | £51.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 June 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northcourt House
Main Road
Shorwell
Newport
Isle of Wight
PO30 3JG
- Phone:
- 01983740415
- Email:
- herapath@northcourt.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window