RSPCA Poole, East Dorset & South Wiltshire branch

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity of the Charity is welfare assistance whereby assistance is given towards the cost of treating owned animals and in the case of feral and stray animals all of the cost is met. We have a telephone 'help line' whereby we receive calls from members of the public and deal with their enquiries. Continuation of a cat neutering scheme incorporating a micro-chipping arrangement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 July 1966: Standard registration
- 21 November 2023: Funds received from 205962 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
- RSPCA POOLE AND EAST DORSET BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA Poole, East Dorset & South Wiltshire branch (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS POOLE AND EAST DORSET BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA POOLE AND EAST DORSET BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Lewis | Chair | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Harris | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Featherstone | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Wildey | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hoy | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wills | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN ADELINE ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Julie Ellen Houghton | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.48k | £259.41k | £79.55k | £33.12k | £80.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.73k | £172.93k | £42.26k | £92.21k | £91.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009. as amended on 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
POOLE AND EAST DORSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 9729
POOLE
BH4 0JA
- Phone:
- 07747292845
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window