OVINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A MEETING PLACE FOR :- WOMENS INSTITUTE, KEEP FIT GROUP, DRAMA GROUP, LOCAL CHOIR TODDLERS PLAYGROUP. AVAILABLE FOR PRIVATE HIRE:- FAMILY PARTIES, LECTURES ETC CRAFT GROUP, FILM CLUB
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 15 August 1966: Standard registration
- OVINGHAM READING ROOM (Working name)
- READING ROOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Laidlow | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Keady | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy White | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine White | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria LIndsay | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Holden | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dean Bowen | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARION LEWIS | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH REED | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.44k | £13.63k | £4.44k | £13.88k | £20.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.63k | £14.04k | £12.53k | £30.50k | £24.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.57k | N/A | N/A | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17TH AUGUST 1970. AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 14TH APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
HALL TO BE USED FOR PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSCIAL TRAINING OF PERSONS RESIDING IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF OVINGHAM.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OVINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 CASTLE VIEW
OVINGHAM
PRUDHOE
NE42 6AT
- Phone:
- 01661836793
- Website:
-
ovinghamreadingroom.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window