Accounts and annual returns PLANNED ENVIRONMENT THERAPY TRUST

Charity number: 248633
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 July 2020 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 July 2020 179 days late
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 January 2018 On Time