THE WIDOWS' FUND: AN ASSOCIATION ESTABLISH FOR THE BENEFIT OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF PROTESTANT DISSENTING MINISTERS AND OF MINISTERS THEMSELVES.
Charity number: 248657
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No change
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Total income: £24,645
Total expenditure: £58,463
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 26 July 1966: Standard registration
- 08 July 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF PROTESTANT DISSENTING MINISTERS AND OF MINISTERS THEMSELVES KNOWN AS THE WIDOWS FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.58k | £33.82k | £32.93k | £29.61k | £24.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.49k | £55.48k | £55.83k | £58.56k | £58.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 21 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 14 November 2014 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 19 November 2014 | 19 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 22 November 2013 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 25 November 2013 | 25 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 27 JUNE 1912 AND RULES IN SCHEDULE TO SETTLEMENT AS AMENDED 1 MAY 1990, 19 JUNE 1997 AND 11 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ANNUITIES TO WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS OF MEMBERS, CHILDREN OF MEMBERS AND MEMBERS THEMSELVES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
INSTITUTED 1825 GOVERNED BY SETTLEMENT DATED 27 JUNE 1912
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF AIDING THE TRUSTS OF THE WIDOWS FUND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 26 July 1966 : Standard registration
- 08 July 2016 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window