LITTLE PORTLAND STREET CHAPEL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 August 1966: Standard registration
- 07 May 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £1.32k | £1.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.30k | £750 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 20 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 31 October 2006 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 25 October 2005 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 10TH OCTOBER 1922
Charitable objects
1) TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE CAPITAL ENDOWMENTS OF THE CHARITY IN OR DEFRAYING THE COST OF FOUNDING A NEW CENTRAL CHAPEL. 2) UNTIL THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE SAID ENDOWMENTS ARE SO APPLIED, THEN FOR THE SUPPORT OF SUCH CONGREGATIONS, BEING MEMBERS OF THE PROVINCIAL ASSEMBLY OF NON-SUBSCRIBING MINISTERS AND CONGREGATIONS OF LONDON AND THE SOUTH-EASTERN COUNTIES AND FREQUENTING CHAPELS WITHIN TEN MILES OF CHARING CROSS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY SELECT. 3) THE RESIDUE FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE NEW CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
CHAPELS WITHIN TEN MILES OF CHARING CROSS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window