Accounts and annual returns THE CENTRAL BOARD OF FINANCE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Charity number: 248711
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 29 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 16 November 2007 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 09 November 2006 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 03 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 15 November 2005 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 29 November 2005 | 29 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window