THE CENTRAL BOARD OF FINANCE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are currently being wound up.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 1966: Standard registration
- 30 December 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 30 December 2008: Funds transferred to 1074857 THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.55k | £377.11k | £9.72k | £7.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £292.17k | £4.51m | £306.02k | £3.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 29 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 16 November 2007 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 22 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 09 November 2006 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 03 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 15 November 2005 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 29 November 2005 | 29 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 1914 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 JUNE 1964, 3 JUNE 1970, 22 FEBRUARY 1975, 2 JUNE 1992, 20 MAY 1998 AND 11 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, AID AND FURTHER, WITHIN THE PROVINCES OF CANTERBURY AND YORK, THE OBJECTS AND WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OF ANY DIOCESE OR PARISH THEREOF. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 27TH MAY 1914 AS AMENDED 22ND FEBRUARY 1975, AND AS AMENDED 2ND JUNE 1992)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ARCHBISHOP DAVIDSON PORTRAIT FUND
- BERNARD PASCHAL PAYNE
- BESSIE HACKER TRUST
- CHAPLAINCY AT THE HAGUE
- CHURCH COLLEGES OF EDUCATION CAPITAL FUND
- CHUTE TRUST FUND
- EDWARD BATHURST COTTON FUND
- HARRIET MCKENZIE TRUST
- HECTOR RICHARD MUNRO
- ISABELLA GILMORE TRUST
- J C PARKER
- JERUSALEM BISHOPRIC
- MARGARET ANN CLARK
- MARY ANN LANDERS BEQUEST
- SOCIETY OF THE TREASURY OF GOD
- ST ANSELM'S ENDOWMENT
- STEPHEN NOEL FURNESS
- THE TRURO TRAINING COLLEGE FOUNDATION
- W T OLIVER TRUST
- YORK HOUSE OF LAYMEN
- 15 September 1966 : Standard registration
- 30 December 2008 : Removed
- 30 December 2008 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window