HENBURY CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Area of activities,the old parish of St Mary the Virgin Henbury Bristol in which we support the church,primary schools,activities for youth and the elderly and sick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 January 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAGGIE WILCOX | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER J A JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD LESLIE CLIFTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAPHNE SPITZER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £6.01k | £2.02k | £5.86k | £3.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £2.70k | £1.73k | £4.73k | £2.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 January 2022 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 30 JANUARY 1979
Charitable objects
1) MAKING PAYMENTS IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HENBURY WITH ST JOHN THE DIVINE, HALLEN 2) FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 24 OF SCHEME 30/1/1979)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HENBURY AS CONSTITUTED 25 APRIL 1879
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Royal Close
Henbury
Bristol
BS10 7XF
- Phone:
- 01173296375
- Email:
- maggiewilcox@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window