Accounts and annual returns JOHN KENRICK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 248832
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 14 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required