Financial history JOHN KENRICK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 248832
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £3.60k £3.77k £3.91k £4.02k £4.25k
Total expenditure £3.70k £3.35k £2.20k £3.80k £4.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A