DEEPING ST JAMES UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 248848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Deeping St. James United Charities makes grants to groups and individuals for sickness, need, public purposes and promoting the education (including social and physical training) of young people who have not attained the age of 25 year who in the opinion of the trustees are in need of financial assistance, to residents of Deeping St. James ecclesiastical parish, including Frognall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £277,349
Total expenditure: £152,282

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 August 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Robinson Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Dawn Julie Dent Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Ian Roger Anderson Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Dr Richard Gamman Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Judy Deanne Stevens Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
MRS KATE SHINKINS Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Rev Mark Robert Williams Trustee 11 September 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEEPING ST JAMES
Recently registered
Steve Goodchild Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £227.07k £260.80k £262.09k £267.38k £277.35k
Total expenditure £110.89k £105.59k £124.66k £108.85k £152.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £70 N/A £282

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 14 JULY 1971
Charitable objects
(A) ONE EQUAL HALF PART OF THE YEARLY INCOME SHALL CONSTITUTE HENCEFORTH PART OF THE INCOME OF THE PUBLIC PURPOSE BRANCH (B) THE OTHER EQUAL HALF PART OF THE YARLY NCOME SHALL CONSTITUTE HENCEOFORTH PART OF THE INCOME OF THE RELIEF IN NEED BRANCH (C) THE INCOME OF THE PUBLIC PURPOSES BRANCH FOR ANY CHARITABLE PUPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, DEEPING FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS (D) SUBJECT TO A $10 PAYMENT TO THE TYTHE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY INCOME APPLICABLE FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITH GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES, DEEPING WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
ECCLESASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES DEEPING
Registration history
  • 10 August 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE INSTITUTE
38 CHURCH STREET
DEEPING ST. JAMES
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 8HD
Phone:
01778380367