POORS LAND

Charity number: 248884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GIVING HAMPERS TO THE NEEDY , IN ULCEBY AND FORDINGTON

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £650
Total expenditure: £775

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 August 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILLIP ODLING Chair
None on record
Richard Butler Trustee
LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS
Received: On time
SARAH BUTLER Trustee
None on record
MS JENNY JONES Trustee
None on record
DIANE VANDEHYDEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £325 £22 £23 £650 £650
Total expenditure £150 £125 £125 £775 £775
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 February 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HILL TOP COTTAGE
FORDINGTON
ALFORD
LN13 0HQ
Phone:
01507462994
Website:

No information available