ROSSINGTON GOOD NEIGHBOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We cook & provide hot meals for people aged 50+ and their carers in Rossington Memorial Hall. For people unable to come to the hall we deliver meals to their homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 16 August 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Jordan | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Derek Attridge | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL WILEMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.25k | £46.95k | £35.03k | £42.94k | £54.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.68k | £34.30k | £38.17k | £46.23k | £51.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £8.21k | £600 | £5.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JUNE 1966 AND RESOLUTION DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 22 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY AND THE VULNERABLE IN THE PARISH OF ROSSINGTON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROSSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rossington Parish Council
Memorial Hall
McConnel Crescent
New Rossington
DONCASTER
DN11 0PL
- Phone:
- 01302864731
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window