EBENEZER FAMILY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to assist individuals and organisations who ascribe to the Christian Evangelical faith and have specific needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 1966: Standard registration
- 01 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 293884 UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1001349 SAMARITAN'S PURSE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 233381 THE BILLY GRAHAM EVANGELISTIC ASSOCIATION LIMITED
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1050327 The Leprosy Mission Great Britain
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1020758 INTERNATIONAL SERVICE FELLOWSHIP TRUST
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 243808 THE WORTHING TABERNACLE
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 213422 SCRIPTURE UNION
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 327384 OUR DAILY BREAD MINISTRIES TRUST
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 294387 Waverley Abbey Trust
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 232759 THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN BIBLE SOCIETY
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1004774 THE CHRISTIAN INSTITUTE
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1119911 ACTS TRUST
- 01 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1096364 AFRICA INLAND MISSION INTERNATIONAL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.47k | £49.64k | £2.98k | £5.06k | £5.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.08k | £3.41k | £50.17k | £2.56k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 26 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 09 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | 09 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 1966 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF APOINTMENT AND RETIREMENT DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLORS OR THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window