SURPLUS FUND OF THE ROYAL NAVY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance to eligible beneficiaries; actively seek to identify potential beneficiaries; monitor progress of invested funds under management
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 September 1966: Standard registration
- ROYAL NAVY CLUB (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Commodore MICHAEL JOHN DELANE WALLIKER CBE | Chair | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
COMMODORE NICOLAS HENRY CHARLES TINDAL RN | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
COMMODORE PHILIP JOHN THICKNESSE | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
COMMANDER ANDREW CHARLES GORDON-LENNOX RN | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
REAR ADMIRAL IAIN ROBERT HENDERSON CB CBE DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.02k | £40.33k | £39.05k | £42.92k | £42.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.11k | £41.53k | £45.56k | £35.85k | £32.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1927 AMENDED BY DEED 14 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
INCOME OF FUND TO BE APPLIED IN THE RELIEF OF DISTRESSED WIDOWS, LEGITIMATE ORPHAN CHILDREN AND SISTERS OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL NAVY CLUB OF 1765 AND 1785 (UNITED 1889) BUT WHO HAVE CEASED TO BE SO BY DEATH OR RESIGNATION AFTER MORE THAN FIVE YEARS, AS THE COMMITTEE DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRAFALGAR
2 Elston Meadow
Westwood
CREDITON
EX17 3SZ
- Phone:
- 01363773421
- Email:
- secretary@royalnavyclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window