Financial history 48TH/58TH FOOT THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE REGIMENTAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 248996
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2009
Total gross income £2.78k £2.26k £2.60k £1.18k £777
Total expenditure £5.83k £3.84k £4.47k £6.58k £17.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A