THE INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IAM RoadSmart provides for the public an advanced driving and motorcycle test, and through its research into many aspects of road safety, seeks to become a significant influencer of road safety policy and practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,521,000
Donations and legacies | £3.66m | |
Charitable activities | £701.00k | |
Other trading activities | £1.98m | |
Investments | £174.00k | |
Other | £4.00k |
Total expenditure:
£6,984,000
Raising funds | £2.69m | |
Charitable activities | £4.29m | |
Other | £0 |
-£203,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.69m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.29m |
People

68 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
5000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 November 1966: Standard registration
- 13 July 2018: Funds received from 1060113 PORTSMOUTH ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 08 February 2019: Funds received from 1006658 WEST PENNINE GROUP OF THE INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED MO...
- 19 July 2021: Funds received from 1053118 WORTHING ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 04 February 2022: Funds received from 1050094 IPSWICH & SUFFOLK ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 19 October 2022: Funds received from 1049110 MANSFIELD GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 21 December 2022: Funds received from 1050382 DARLINGTON ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 07 July 2023: Funds received from 1053590 BIRMINGHAM ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 15 September 2023: Funds received from 1049607 TEESSIDE ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- 20 November 2023: Funds received from 1098808 KIDDERMINSTER ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- I A M (Working name)
- IAM (Working name)
- IAM ROADSMART (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shona Johnstone | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Armitage | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jonathan Powell | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jennifer Whiteside-Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert John Luke Newman | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bell | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Kelman | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ann Milford | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Antony Stein | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David John Lomas | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.34m | £5.73m | £6.32m | £6.17m | £6.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.24m | £5.67m | £6.40m | £7.22m | £6.98m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £177.00k | £123.00k | £169.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.21m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.68m | £3.44m | £3.57m | £3.48m | £3.66m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.95m | £1.61m | £2.08m | £1.95m | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £431.00k | £178.00k | £487.00k | £503.00k | £701.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £278.00k | £153.00k | £174.00k | £222.00k | £174.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £340.00k | £14.00k | £19.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £7.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.71m | £3.44m | £3.85m | £4.12m | £4.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.52m | £519.09k | £770.00k | £3.10m | £2.69m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £122.00k | £120.00k | £159.00k | £172.00k | £134.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £42.74k | £409.09k | £43.08k | £0 | £19.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £1.71m | £1.78m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £475.00k | £463.00k | £432.00k | £365.00k | £280.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.43m | £7.90m | £8.44m | £7.05m | £6.57m | |
|
Other assets | £1.65m | £1.40m | £1.56m | £1.49m | £1.40m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.31m | £1.08m | £1.40m | £1.64m | £1.66m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MARCH 1956, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1994, 19TH MARCH 1997, 20TH FEBRUARY 2009 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2009, REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE PROMOTION OF ROAD SAFETY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO), THE OPERATION OF AN ADVANCED DRIVING TEST
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IAM RoadSmart
1 Albany Place
Hyde Way
Welwyn Garden City
AL7 3BT
- Phone:
- 02089969600
- Email:
- enquiries@iam.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window